DE SB15 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill creates a tax exemption for community-owned swimming pools in New Castle County only.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To County Taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-17 Stricken
2009-06-29 Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2009-06-29 Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2009-06-10 Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2009-01-27 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback