DE SB142 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Bill eliminates the need of a quorum of a board or commission under Title 23, Title 24 or Title 28 to sign a decision that was previously approved by a quorum of its members and allows the Order to be issued under the signature of the board/commission president or other officer.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Related To Civil Administrative Procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2011-06-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-16 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |