DE SB142 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill is a result of recommendations made by the Joint Sunset Committee. The Bill deletes the section of the statute referencing the Office of Information Services and adds an additional member to the Technology and Investment Council to include the Director of the Office of Management and Budget

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Information And Technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-06 Signed by Governor
2009-07-06 Signed by Governor
2009-06-24 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2009-06-23 Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2009-06-18 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
2009-06-17 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2009-06-11 Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2009-06-04 Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback