DE SB135 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee approved a project to work with the Governor's Office throughout 2018 and 2019 to identify antiquated boards, commissions, and councils that need statutory updates or outright repeals. The Governor's Council on Agriculture was identified as needing updates to require 7 members rather than up to 7 members, and to remove the party balance requirement to make it easier to fill vacancies. Consideration must given to geographical and other diversities when appointing members.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Governor's Council On Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-20 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |