DE SB131 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act authorizes the State and its counties and municipalities to install and use vehicle height monitoring systems ("vehicle height monitoring system") to assist in the enforcement of applicable State, county, or municipal law regarding motor vehicle size. This Act is patterned after Maryland's vehicle height monitoring system law, under which the City of Baltimore recently implemented an ordinance to use vehicle height monitoring system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Size And Weight Of Vehicles And Loads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT
2019-06-30 Suspension of Rules in House
2019-06-30 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2019-06-19 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2019-06-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 ABSENT
2019-06-18 Lifted From Table in Senate
2019-06-18 Laid On Table in Senate
2019-06-12 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2019-05-31 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback