DE SB131 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill implements recommendations made by the Joint Sunset Committee following its review of the Gaming Control Board. The Bill: 1) Changes the name of the Gaming Control Board to the Board of Charitable Gaming. 2) Gives the Board authority to regulate third party vendors to determine licensure suitability, to include a criminal background check similar to Texas Hold ‘Em dealers and proof of a valid Delaware business license. 3) Changes the member designation of the Board to include the State Lottery Office Director or his designee to bring knowledge and experience in matters of gaming and a member representing a non-profit/charitable organization. 4) Allows for the State Lottery Office to transfer funds to the Division of Professional Regulation to hire contractual investigators to conduct inspections and investigations. 5) Requires the Board to conduct public hearings pursuant to the Administrative Procedures Act for adopting regulations. 6) Clarifies the definition of “charitable gaming.” 7) Allows for members of the Board whose terms expire to continue to participate in meetings until replaced by the Governor.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 28 , Chapters 11, 15 And 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Charitable Gaming.
Sponsors
Rep. John Atkins [D] | Rep. Edward Bennett [D] | Sen. George Bunting [D] | Sen. Michael Katz [D] |
Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] |
Sen. Gary Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2011-06-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2011-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-14 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |