DE SB128 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a special license plate for members of the Dover Air Force Base Chiefs Group.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Or Registration Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-04-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2018-01-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-01-25 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 128 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-28 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 128 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |