DE SB122 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act fulfills recommendations made by the Joint Legislative Overview and Sunset Committee (JLOSC) by making amendments to the State Human Relations Commissions (the Commission) governing statute.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Human Relations Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 122 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 122 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-22 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2017-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |