DE SB122 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The amendment to Section 49A-120(a) adds a new subsection clarifying that no person may refuse to accept an otherwise valid durable personal power of attorney on the sole basis that it varies from the form set forth in Section 49A-301. The amendment to Section 49A-301 clarifies that the use of the form set forth in Section 49A-301 is merely suggested and not required in order to create a valid durable personal power of attorney.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 12, Chapter 49a Of The Delaware Code Relating To Durable Personal Powers Of Attorney
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Rep. Melanie Smith [D] | Rep. Rebecca Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-06-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |