DE SB12 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act facilitates electric vehicle and grid-integrated electric vehicle interconnection by including the Society of Automotive Engineers industrial safety standard, J3072, which sets safety requirements for electric vehicles that provide power from their batteries back to the electric grid.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Generating Systems With The New Society Of Automotive Engineers Electric Safety Standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-22 | Assigned to Energy Committee in House | |
2019-03-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-01-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Energy Committee in Senate |