DE SB110 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act removes the Colonel of the New Castle County Police Department from the Delaware Emergency Medical Services Oversight Council ("DEMSOC") and replaces the Colonel with the Chief of the New Castle County Emergency Medical Services. In 2006, the County restructured the Department of Public Safety so that the Chief of Police is no longer in charge of the paramedics. The Chief of the New Castle County Emergency Medical Services has been designated as the representative by the Colonel; however, any requests for a substitute representative with voting proxy would have to be done by the Colonel. This change thus reflects the current organization of New Castle County Emergency Medical Services but does not change the entity that has a member on DEMSOC.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Emergency Medical Services Systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2017-06-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback