DE HJR11 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This resolution honors Boyd and Liane Sorenson by designating the new Valley Road Pedestrian Pathway between Evanson Road and Lantana Square as "Sorenson's Way".
Title
Honoring Boyd And Liane Sorenson By Designating The New Valley Road Pedestrian Pathway Between Evanson Road And Lantana Square As "sorenson's Way".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-29 | Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |