DE HCR38 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Resolution establishes a Port of Wilmington Expansion Task Force to provide recommendations in regards to expanding the operations at the Port of Wilmington.
Title
Establishing A Port Of Wilmington Expansion Task Force To Study Feasibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-23 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-23 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House |
2015-06-23 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-17 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-03 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |