DE HB99 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act confirms that nursery stock as defined in Title 3, Chapter 13, Nurseries and Nursery Stock, includes clones and seedlings.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-04-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-25 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2021-03-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-03-19 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-19 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 6 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |