DE HB98 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act would allow importers to take orders from retailers any day including Sundays and holidays and process them for delivery.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-30 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2021-03-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-03-26 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |