DE HB93 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act tightens the role and responsibilities of the Division of Developmental Disabilities Services (DDDS) so that it more aptly aligns with the current state of the agency. This act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-09 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-04-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |