DE HB93 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

As non-profit entities, rural electric cooperatives are exempt from the fee imposed for a business license and the taxes assessed on gross receipts set forth in Chapter 23 of Title 30. This Act confirms that the non-commercial generation of solar electricity by a rural electric cooperative is also exempt from the business license requirements and gross receipts taxation otherwise applicable to steam, gas and electric companies producing electricity for sale in this State. Municipalities are already exempt from payment of gross receipts taxes on the production of electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 The Delaware Code Relating To Steam, Gas And Electric Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2016-06-23SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-15SenateReported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2015-06-17SenateAssigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2015-06-16HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-16HouseAmendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2015-06-16HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
2015-05-06HouseReported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2015-04-16HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback