DE HB92 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates an Expanded Learning Opportunities Subcommittee as part of the Interagency Resource Management Committee (IRMC) to provide research, recommendations, and coordination regarding before and after school programs and summer learning opportunities for school-age children. The chairperson of the subcommittee is also added to the Interagency Resource Management Committee as a non-voting member. The creation of an Expanded Learning Opportunities Subcommittee was one of the primary recommendations of the Statewide Afterschool Initiative Task Force, which was created by the 148th General Assembly. The Task Force felt that the design and delivery of services would be enhanced by a standing body tasked with tracking developments across the country and in the State, with a view towards encouraging the development of programs and funding models that maximize positive outcomes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 2 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-05 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-30 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 92, and Assigned to Education Committee in House |