DE HB89 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill promotes and facilitates the construction and operation within the State of Delaware of freestanding inpatient rehabilitation hospitals, which generally are capable of providing services to victims of stroke, spinal cord injuries, amputation or other traumas. No person shall be required to apply for or obtain a Certificate of Public Review for purposes of constructing, developing or establishing a freestanding inpatient rehabilitation hospital.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Planning And Resources Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 0 NO 4 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-05-16 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2013-04-24 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |