DE HB75 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Laid On Table in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is the final leg of a constitutional amendment that would eliminate from the Delaware Constitution the limitations as to when an individual may vote by absentee ballot. This amendment to the Delaware Constitution provides that the General Assembly shall enact general laws providing the circumstances, rules, and procedures for absentee voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concurring In A Proposed Amendment To Article V Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Laid On Table in House
2021-06-17 Roll Call Rescinded in House
2021-06-17 Restored in House
2021-06-10 Defeated By House. Votes: 25 YES 14 NO 2 NOT VOTING
2021-01-21 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 Unfavorable
2021-01-14 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback