DE HB60 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill prohibits public schools, including charter schools, and school districts from making available or serving food with more than 0.5 gram of artificial trans fatty acids to students in grades K through 12.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Limiting Artificial Trans Fats In Food Available Or Served To Students In Public Schools, Including Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-24 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 1 NO 14 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |