DE HB59 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This amendment clarifies the procedures for the assessment of taxes, providing the option to use Sussex County assessments or to cause the Town’s own assessment to be prepared, clarifies the procedures for supplementary assessments, and provides that the tax lien is imposed for a period of 10 years.
Title
An Act To Amend Volume 57, Chapter 504, Laws Of Delaware, As Amended, Entitled "an Act To Incorporate The Town Of Henlopen Acres", Sections 21, 21.a, 22, And 23, To Update The Procedure For Assessment And Appeal Of Taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-26 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |