DE HB54 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes an optional mid-year unit count and associated funding provisions. School districts and charter schools that elect to participate in the optional mid-year unit count shall receive state financial support for each additional unit, or fraction thereof, in an amount determined by the annual Appropriations Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Optional Mid-year Unit Count.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-10 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-10 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-04 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-03-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 8 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-23 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 54, and Assigned to Education Committee in House |