DE HB51 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies Delawares driving under the influence (DUI) law related to intensive inpatient or outpatient drug and alcohol treatment for felony DUI offenders. The current law has resulted in differing interpretations regarding treatment; specifically, whether treatment must be completed while incarcerated (Level V) or at home confinement (Level IV), rather than at community supervision (Level III or Level II). This has resulted in extending incarceration for some offenders or requiring out-of-state offenders to reside in Delaware to complete the mandated drug and alcohol abstinence program and drug and alcohol treatment program under § 4177(d)(9) of Title 21.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Driving A Vehicle While Under The Influence.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-01-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-01-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-27 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2021-01-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-01-26 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-01-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |