DE HB49 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires all new school construction and schools undergoing major renovations to incorporate the following safety features: a secured vestibule to be used as the primary entrance to screen visitors, installation of ballistic resistant glass or other ballistic resistant materials in all areas used to screen visitors, installation of a panic button or intruder alert system, and classroom doors that can be locked on the outside with a key or magnetic card locking system. Further, the Act provides that the Office of Management and Budget Facilities Management Section shall coordinate a review of construction plans with the Department of Homeland Security to verify compliance with this Act and evaluate the security and safety of new schools and schools planning major renovations. This Act shall be known as the Representative Joseph E. Miro School Safety Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 14 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14 Signed by Governor
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2018-03-29 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits
2018-03-20 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2018-03-20 was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 49

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback