DE HB477 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation clarifies that a pharmaceutical wholesaler located inside or outside of the state that ships pharmaceutical drugs to a pharmaceutical distribution wholesaler in this state is exempt from the gross receipts tax.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Related To The Delaware Wholesale License Fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Colin Bonini [R] | Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] |
Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |