DE HB46 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill excludes certain criminal convictions from mandatory expungement and discretionary expungement following a pardon.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10 And 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Records Of Arrest And Prosecution.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Rep. James Johnson [D] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Liane Sorenson [R] | Rep. Robert Walls [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-03-26 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |