DE HB457 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides for a residential electrician license. A residential electrician license allows for a person to conduct residential electrical work without having to be under the direct onsite supervision of a licensed master electrician, master electrician special, limited electrician, limited electrician special or journeyperson electrician. Electricians with a residential electrician license are permitted to perform electric work performed on or within a residential dwelling or building prior to the dwelling or building being connected to the electric grid, or work to or beyond the breaker panel or fuse box in a residential dwelling or building, or residential low voltage electric work.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Electricians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2018-06-14 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 30 YES 6 NO 4 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 457 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 457 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |