DE HB45 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies (i) how personal jurisdiction shall be obtained over nonresident respondents in administrative proceedings brought by the Director of Consumer Protection pursuant to Section 2523, Title 29 of the Code, and (ii) the manner in which service of process may be made upon respondents in those proceedings.This Act also empowers administrative hearing officers appointed under Section 2523(b), Title 29 to issue subpoenas upon request of the parties to the administrative proceeding, in order to enable the parties to present evidence not otherwise available to them.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-09 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-08 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 45 - Defeated By House. Votes: 9 YES 29 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 45 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-05 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 45 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-04 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 45 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-01-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |