DE HB443 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act permits the Secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to renew or extend the term of a construction permit under certain circumstances.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] |
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Rep. Bryon Short [D] |
Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-14 | Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 443 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 443 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-07 | Re-Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2018-06-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |