DE HB443 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act permits the Secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to renew or extend the term of a construction permit under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2018-06-14 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-14 Amendment HA 1 to HB 443 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 443 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-07 Re-Assigned to Labor Committee in House
2018-06-06 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback