DE HB441 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides an alternative means for an educator to demonstrate competency and achieve a standard certificate beyond simply passing a content exam, such as the Praxis II. For those who are within 2 standard errors of measurement of the passing score, a certificate will be issued if the applicant has either (i) a GPA of 3.5 or higher; or (ii) a GPA between 3.0 and 3.49 and demonstrated competency through micro-credentialing, successful completion of a residency, or passing scores on performance assessments. Special education, administrator, and specialist certifications are not available through this alternate measure.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educator Licensure And Certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] | Sen. Laura Sturgeon [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Lockman [D] |
Rep. William Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-14 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 6 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |