DE HB429 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cybersecurity attacks, including data breaches, corporate theft, and sabotage perpetrated by state and non-state actors throughout the world present unique threats to Delaware residents, governments, businesses, and critical infrastructure. Statewide coordination is required to effectively ensure cybersecurity protection.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Technology And Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-07-01 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-19 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 429 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 429 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 429 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 429 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 429 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Telecommunication Internet & Technology) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Telecommunication Internet & Technology Committee in House |