DE HB419 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires the Department of Services for Children, Youth, and Their Families (DSCYF) to provide new luggage to children in foster care to use for the transportation of their personal belongings when entering custody, moving from one placement to another, or exiting custody, and makes clear that disposable bags and trash bags may not be used for these purposes. It requires the Department to establish and maintain an inventory of new luggage for this purpose. The Department must annually provide a report containing a current accounting of supply inventory and inventory management procedures.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To New Luggage For Children In The Custody Of The Department Of Services For Children, Youth, And Their Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-18 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |