DE HB411 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill seeks to amend sections of Chapter 66 concerning the members of Delaware Volunteer Fire Departments. This bill will hold current members to the same standards as applicants with relation to criminal activity.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Membership Requirements For Volunteer Firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-20 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2024-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 411 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 411 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |