DE HB405 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is intended to facilitate the growth and expansion of Delaware licensed craft alcoholic liquor companies within the State by permitting them to ship product manufactured on their licensed premises to entities under common ownership and control, as defined. This bill is not intended to unconditionally except craft alcoholic liquor companies from the traditional three-tier system.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcohol.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Sen. Gary Simpson [R] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |