DE HB404 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To address the significant spread and impact of Lyme Disease in Delaware, this bill creates a Lyme Disease intervention fund. The fund shall be overseen by the Department of Agriculture and shall have the goal of reducing the prevalence of Lyme disease and potential for contracting Lyme disease on State owned lands. The Department shall investigate the best ways to do that, focusing on ones that are the most effective, environmentally sensitive, and innovative. The Department of Agriculture will coordinate its efforts in the administration of the fund with the Division of Public Health and the Department of Natural Resources. The Joint Finance Committee shall determine the yearly amount of the fund.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Lyme Disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-11 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-06-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 404 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-05-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |