DE HB4 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill expressly prohibits employment discrimination based on surviving sexual assault, domestic violence, or stalking. Employers must provide reasonable accommodations, which may include re-purposing accrued leave originally designated for a different purpose.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-03 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-05-28 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 10 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |