DE HB393 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a result of the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee's ("JLOSC") review of Adult Protective Services ("APS"). JLOSC approved recommendations to modify several areas of the APS statute, Chapter 39 of Title 31. Based on the recommendations, this Act does all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Adult Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-11 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-05-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |