DE HB385 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows any municipality with a population of 50,000 or more to establish by ordinance rules for the location of liquor stores that are more restrictive than state law, and requires the Alcohol Commissioner to refuse a license for any new establishment that does not comply with those rules.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Licenses For Sale Of Alcoholic Beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Sen. Darius Brown [D] | Rep. Nnamdi Chukwuocha [D] | Rep. Sherry Dorsey Walker [D] |
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Franklin Cooke [D] | Rep. Kendra Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-12 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2022-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |