DE HB383 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act designates Maypole dancing as the official dance of Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Designation Of A State Dance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 7 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-12 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |