DE HB382 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act has the effect of renaming the Delaware Department of Transportation Welcome Center on Interstate 95 at 530 JFK Memorial Highway, Newark, Delaware as the "Biden Welcome Center" in honor of the Biden family. This gesture is made because of the exemplary service to the State of Delaware the Bidens have provided, and because of their lifelong promotion of this State.
Title
An Act To Rename The Delaware Department Of Transportation Welcome Center On Interstate 95 Located At 530 Jfk Memorial Highway Newark, De 19702 In Honor Of The Bidens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2018-05-02 | Tabled in Committee | |
2018-04-24 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |