DE HB380 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This proposed tax credit intends to create incentives for existing businesses to partner with the State in the effort to create new employment opportunities for Delaware citizens, and to stimulate the Delaware economy by expanding the tax base. A finder’s fee, a tool used commonly by businesses, is an arrangement by which an intermediary finds, introduces, and brings together parties to a business opportunity. This bill creates a tax credit program that would award each Sponsor Firm and each New Business Firm with a $500 annual tax credit per Delaware job created by the new business, with the tax credit available for three years. The program would require that the new business be brought to Delaware as a result of the efforts of the sponsor, and would specifically exclude those business, such as real estate agents, banks and commercial landlords, that already have an incentive to bring out-of-state business to Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Economic Development Incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-06 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 6 Favorable | |
2010-04-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |