DE HB38 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill places the same requirements for the issuance of non-potable well permits within existing areas where a water utility has been granted a Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity as those that currently apply to the issuance of a potable well permit.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nonutility Wells And Permits For Nonutility Wells Within Service Territory Served By A Water Utility Under A Certificate Of Public Convenience And Necessity.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] |
Rep. Kevin Hensley [R] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] | Rep. Harvey Kenton [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 38 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-12 | Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2017-05-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-05-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 38 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-05-10 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 38 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-01-18 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-01-17 | Introduced in House and Assigned to House Administration Committee |