DE HB378 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill strikes 1500(8) of Title 26 of the Delaware Code which has the unintended consequence of mandating a decoupled design mechanism.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Energy Efficiency Resource Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-05-06 | Assigned to Energy & Transit Committee in Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-04 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-04 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-04-29 | Reported Out of Committee (ENERGY) in House with 4 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-22 | Introduced in House and assigned to Energy Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned to Energy Committee in House |