DE HB377 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires the Department of Education to conduct an annual workforce study of early childhood professionals to support the development of a plan and implementation of a system of supports to grow and deepen the early childhood workforce. The first study is due by November 15, 2022, the plan by January 31, 2023, and implementation of the system should be in place by September 1, 2023.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Early Childhood Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-09 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-05-04 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-28 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 377, and Assigned to Education Committee in House |