DE HB377 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill moves the date of 2018 primary election for statewide office, county office, and municipal office from September 11, 2018, to September 6, 2018. September 11, 2018, is the conclusion of Rosh Hashanah.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Primary Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |
2016-06-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |