DE HB375 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes the Racial Equity Consortium (Consortium) for the purposes of studying and making recommendations to address the disparities and inequities faced by persons of color in this State.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Racial Equity Consortium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-15 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-07 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 375 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 Favorable | |
2022-05-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 375 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-05-12 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-05-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |