DE HB367 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This is a housekeeping bill to codify the existing practices with administering the Municipal Street Aid program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Motor Fuel Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-28 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |