DE HB366 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows a licensee or a potential licensee of Child Care to appeal a decision by the Secretary of DSCYF to revoke, suspend or deny their application for a license. This appeal would go to Superior Court on the record and pursuant to the Administrative Procedures Act. Currently, there is no direct appeal right to Superior Court for a licensee or potential licensee. The bill also makes minor changes to the administrative hearings, to bring them into compliance with the Administrative Procedures Act. Finally, the bill codifies the process for when a licensee has their license suspended or revoked. The process laid out in this bill is already the process set forth in the Office of Childcare Licensing regulations and procedures manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (CHILDREN; YOUTH & FAMILIES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Children; Youth & Families Committee in Senate |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 13 On Its Merits |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |